Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 55 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2981 Week
» 4719 Month
» 132162 Year
» 1797538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2559
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1373   02/01/1934
B16 845   18/07/1936
B16 841   13/12/1938
B16 2370   30/09/1941
B16 1379   24/03/1945
B16 1445   14/11/1947