Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 383 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4875 Week
» 29709 Month
» 64041 Year
» 1729417 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24012
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61449   16/02/1952
B16 61453   04/10/1954
B16 61472   22/06/1957
B16 61420   21/09/1960