Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 740 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6667 Week
» 5405 Month
» 419726 Year
» 1641291 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1535
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2382   31/08/1923
B16 2372   05/05/1931
B16 1380   09/03/1934
B16 2379   11/02/1938
B16 845   31/01/1941
B16 923   05/02/1944