Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 54 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2980 Week
» 4718 Month
» 132161 Year
» 1797537 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24073
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61474   01/11/1952
B16 61455   06/08/1955
B16 61440   28/11/1957
B16 61476   13/04/1961