Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 126 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4618 Week
» 29452 Month
» 63784 Year
» 1729160 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2877/24082
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 924   01/03/1937
B16 1376   04/03/1941
B16 1406   26/04/1947
B16 61416   01/07/1950
B16 61429   26/10/1956
B16 61413   20/08/1960