Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 496 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5483 Week
» 13598 Month
» 141041 Year
» 1806417 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2773/24063
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2381   15/05/1936
B16 1372   07/11/1939
B16 847   21/12/1942
B16 926   04/09/1946
B16 61422   31/03/1949
B16 61443   08/08/1956