Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1132 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7815 Week
» 18861 Month
» 18861 Year
» 1684237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3165
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2364   06/05/1941
B16 909   31/03/1943
B16 2366   13/07/1946
B16 61457   26/08/1949