Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 374 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 374 Week
» 26995 Month
» 26995 Year
» 1692371 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3025/24086
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2368   17/06/1939
B16 2375   23/02/1946
B16 61412   10/06/1950
B16 61434   31/08/1956
B16 61450   05/02/1959