Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1062 Yesterday
» 4794 Week
» 3532 Month
» 417853 Year
» 1639418 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1592
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1384   01/01/1924
B16 942   19/01/1931
B16 911   21/08/1933
B16 1380   30/12/1937
B16 1385   16/10/1940