Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 713 Today
» 1093 Yesterday
» 1806 Week
» 28427 Month
» 28427 Year
» 1693803 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24053
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61464   15/03/1952
B16 61449   19/06/1954
B16 61453   30/11/1956
B16 61417   23/10/1959