Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 272 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4991 Week
» 16136 Month
» 115921 Year
» 1781297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1564
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1374   23/10/1923
B16 923   12/09/1929
B16 932   28/06/1932
B16 1372   01/02/1935
B16 1377   22/12/1939