Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1099 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7782 Week
» 18828 Month
» 18828 Year
» 1684204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1499
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2376   29/05/1923
B16 1383   11/10/1932
B16 942   19/11/1935
B16 925   06/09/1940