Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 58 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2984 Week
» 4722 Month
» 132165 Year
» 1797541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2887
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2377   26/10/1938
B16 2382   22/07/1941
B16 1378   24/02/1945
B16 1433   14/08/1947