Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 115 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1184 Week
» 1184 Month
» 68046 Year
» 1733422 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1429
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 966   09/1911
O4 102   03/06/1916
O4 6316   27/09/1924
O4 5405   09/04/1927
O4 6294   20/01/1930
O4 5405   12/03/1932
O4 6245   24/06/1933