Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 630 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6161 Week
» 30995 Month
» 65327 Year
» 1730703 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1273
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6184   28/07/1928
O4 5966   15/11/1930
O4 6335   24/06/1933
O4 5378   21/09/1935
O4 5005   18/12/1937