Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 654 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6185 Week
» 31019 Month
» 65351 Year
» 1730727 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1955
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2001   02/1919
O4 331   03/02/1922
O4 6526   12/11/1932
O4 5966   20/07/1935
O4 6327   04/09/1937
O4 6583   23/12/1939