Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 408 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4900 Week
» 29734 Month
» 64066 Year
» 1729442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1026
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6216   15/08/1925
O4 6330   04/10/1930
O4 5069   13/08/1932
O4 6300   31/08/1935
O4 5966   21/08/1937