Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 629 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6160 Week
» 30994 Month
» 65326 Year
» 1730702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3284
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5392   10/04/1937
O4 6214   10/01/1942
O4 6240   09/09/1944
O4 3500   14/12/1946
O4 63877   26/11/1949