Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 65 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4557 Week
» 29391 Month
» 63723 Year
» 1729099 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1182
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
C5 365   12/1906
C5 364 LADY HENDERSON 18/03/1911
O4 5331   07/01/1933
O4 6552   23/05/1936
O4 6257   13/08/1938
O4 63862   12/03/1949