Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 212 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3244 Week
» 21296 Month
» 254216 Year
» 1919592 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3394
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6213   27/04/1940
O4 6216   14/03/1942
O4 6263   26/06/1943
O4 5331   07/04/1945
O4 63907   23/06/1948