Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 630 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1646 Week
» 19698 Month
» 252618 Year
» 1917994 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3287
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6551   17/04/1937
O4 6501   17/06/1939
O4 5418   04/07/1942
O4 6524   06/01/1945
O4 3585   17/11/1947