Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 302 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1143 Week
» 15079 Month
» 142522 Year
» 1807898 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1431
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 332   10/1911
O4 1815   10/1917
O4 1619   07/1918
O4 93   01/11/1919
O4 406   28/02/1922
O4 6507   24/01/1931
O4 6198   27/10/1934
O4 6542   07/08/1937
O4 6543   20/07/1940
O4 6365   17/10/1942