Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 61 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4553 Week
» 29387 Month
» 63719 Year
» 1729095 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1464
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1198   09/1912
O4 332   02/1918
O4 5353   11/05/1929
O4 6504   15/08/1931
O4 6263   24/02/1934
O4 6530   18/07/1936
O4 6626   28/01/1939
O4 6640   29/06/1940