Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 889 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5516 Week
» 7254 Month
» 134697 Year
» 1800073 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #930
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5383   29/09/1928
O4 6546   18/07/1931
O4 6359   21/07/1934
O4 5379   05/09/1936
O4 6307   22/10/1938
O4 6361   23/11/1940
O4 6496   12/06/1943
O4 6342   16/02/1946
O4 3586   29/02/1948