Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 632 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1540 Week
» 12685 Month
» 112470 Year
» 1777846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3352
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6363   12/11/1938
O4 6329   03/05/1941
O4 5333   02/10/1943
O4 6210   29/06/1946
O4 63801   09/10/1948