Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 1012 Today
» 887 Yesterday
» 6814 Week
» 18051 Month
» 250971 Year
» 1916347 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1271
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6551   11/05/1935
O4 5015   24/04/1937
O4 6578   29/06/1940
O4 6596   19/12/1942
O4 3506   16/03/1946
O4 3583   04/10/1947