Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 506 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7189 Week
» 18235 Month
» 18235 Year
» 1683611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3259
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5334   29/08/1936
O4 6359   05/11/1938
O4 6227   04/01/1941
O4 5102   07/02/1942
O4 5133   22/07/1944
O4 3774   17/08/1946
O4 63614   05/02/1949