Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 296 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1365 Week
» 1365 Month
» 68227 Year
» 1733603 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #588
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6280   28/11/1929
O4 6533   14/11/1931
O4 5408   04/08/1934
O4 6306   04/07/1936
O4 5334   08/02/1941
O4 6252   11/12/1943