Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 142 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1211 Week
» 1211 Month
» 68073 Year
» 1733449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3663
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15D
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6352   16/03/1940
O4 6612   28/03/1942
O4 5093   16/10/1943
O4 3848   31/12/1948