Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 976 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5468 Week
» 30302 Month
» 64634 Year
» 1730010 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1501
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1235   11/1912
O4 102   16/07/1919
O4 390   01/10/1921
O4 6202   26/02/1927
O4 6281   29/08/1931