Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4625 Week
» 29459 Month
» 63791 Year
» 1729167 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1951
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 102   12/11/1923
O4 6554   28/11/1931
O4 6522   18/08/1934
O4 6220   12/08/1936
O4 6301   05/11/1938