Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 226 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5757 Week
» 30591 Month
» 64923 Year
» 1730299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #854
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5102   23/02/1928
O4 6217   22/10/1932
O4 6327   31/08/1935
O4 6335   02/10/1937
O4 6334   01/06/1940
O4 5388   16/05/1942