Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 698 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 698 Week
» 19599 Month
» 19599 Year
» 1684975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1023
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6636   16/07/1931
O4 6506   14/10/1933
O4 6199   05/06/1936
O4 6376   13/05/1939
O4 6224   24/05/1941
O4 5010   18/12/1943
O4 3509   16/11/1946