Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 623 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1639 Week
» 19691 Month
» 252611 Year
» 1917987 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1270
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6302   27/04/1935
O4 6598   03/10/1936
O4 6374   15/10/1938
O4 6252   24/05/1941
O4 6192   25/12/1943
O4 3837   21/09/1946
O4 63607   25/06/1949