Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 2 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5533 Week
» 7271 Month
» 134714 Year
» 1800090 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1749
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1885   06/1918
O4 1220   15/07/1918
O4 5001   26/08/1925
O4 6246   04/03/1930
O4 5413   12/11/1932
O4 5155   31/08/1935