Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 31 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 849 Week
» 17800 Month
» 170753 Year
» 1836129 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3325
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5155   16/04/1938
O4 5010   26/07/1941
O4 6357   29/01/1944
O4 3779   06/12/1947
O4 63573   04/02/1950