Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 666 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 666 Week
» 19567 Month
» 19567 Year
» 1684943 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3219
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6236   09/11/1935
O4 6224   12/03/1938
O4 6192   14/06/1941
O4 5155   04/03/1944
O4 5005   17/08/1946
O4 63721   13/08/1949