Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 591 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1499 Week
» 12644 Month
» 112429 Year
» 1777805 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1082
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6589   28/05/1932
O4 6348   09/02/1935
O4 6616   20/04/1940
O4 6630   14/03/1942
O4 6272   06/05/1944
O4 3511   06/07/1946