Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 697 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 697 Week
» 19598 Month
» 19598 Year
» 1684974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1490
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1224   10/1912
O4 6261   09/08/1924
O4 6216   12/07/1930
O4 5400   11/02/1933
O4 6536   08/02/1936