Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 533 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1705 Week
» 20606 Month
» 20606 Year
» 1685982 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1049
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6354   08/12/1933
O4 6637   18/01/1936
O4 5400   06/08/1938
O4 6532   12/10/1940
O4 6333   17/04/1943