Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 337 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5056 Week
» 16201 Month
» 115986 Year
» 1781362 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1297
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6562   29/06/1935
O4 6527   02/10/1937
O4 6214   11/11/1939
O4 5400   14/02/1942
O4 6302   11/03/1944
O4 3716   05/04/1947
O4 63767   28/05/1949