Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 342 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5061 Week
» 16206 Month
» 115991 Year
» 1781367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #924
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2079   08/1919
O4 6376   23/06/1931
O4 6369   21/10/1933
O4 6604   09/11/1935
O4 5402   22/10/1938
O4 6302   15/11/1941
O4 6253   15/04/1944
O4 3597   03/05/1947