Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 274 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1182 Week
» 12327 Month
» 112112 Year
» 1777488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1112
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1875   05/1918
O4 5403   28/11/1931
O4 6546   02/06/1934
O4 6518   24/07/1936
O4 5394   06/05/1939