Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 950 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3256 Week
» 28090 Month
» 62422 Year
» 1727798 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1130
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6533   09/06/1934
O4 6561   04/07/1936
O4 6590   05/10/1938
O4 5403   07/12/1940
O4 6558   06/03/1943
O4 6554   09/06/1945
O4 3730   25/08/1947