Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 106 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3524 Week
» 28358 Month
» 62690 Year
» 1728066 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3407
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6636   27/07/1940
O4 6288   23/05/1942
O4 5403   09/12/1944
O4 3684   20/08/1947
O4 63695   17/06/1950