Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 607 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1515 Week
» 12660 Month
» 112445 Year
» 1777821 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1019
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6261   02/06/1932
O4 5404   23/02/1935
O4 6266   03/04/1937
O4 6627   14/10/1939
O4 6555   31/10/1942