Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 269 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1177 Week
» 12322 Month
» 112107 Year
» 1777483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #862
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6232   24/03/1928
O4 6345   12/11/1932
O4 5404   13/03/1937
O4 6272   04/11/1939
O4 6616   28/02/1942
O4 6608   17/06/1944
O4 3734   21/09/1946
O4 63720   02/10/1948