Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 954 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3260 Week
» 28094 Month
» 62426 Year
» 1727802 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1687
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1194   07/07/1917
O4 405   13/12/1919
O4 388   08/08/1922
O4 6358   19/07/1924
O4 6340   14/06/1930
O4 5335   24/12/1932