Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 591 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1499 Week
» 12644 Month
» 112429 Year
» 1777805 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1274
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2153   06/1919
O4 6323   21/02/1925
O4 6240   12/07/1930
O4 5354   10/12/1932
O4 5405   08/06/1935