Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 76 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4568 Week
» 29402 Month
» 63734 Year
» 1729110 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1144
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1820   10/1917
O4 406   06/12/1919
O4 1190   04/03/1922
O4 1214   03/11/1923
O4 6347   12/11/1932
O4 6611   08/12/1934
O4 6186   21/11/1936